Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arlen House East Condo Assn Inc, filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint case represented by Susan H Aprill, against A H E Restaurant Management Group, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Caryn Canner Schwartz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Order of Dismissal
Date: June 06, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 25, 2018Motion:
Date: October 04, 2017Request:
Date: September 28, 2017Order:
Date: June 05, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: August 18, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: June 09, 2017Memorandum of Disposition
Date: May 30, 2017Request for Production
Date: August 28, 2017Order:
Date: May 30, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: April 17, 2017Request for Production
Date: May 23, 2017Motion:
Date: March 08, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: June 27, 2017Memorandum of Disposition
Date: May 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: April 27, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: October 31, 2017Motion:
Date: November 20, 2017Motion:
Date: June 09, 2017Motion:
Date: June 15, 2017Response:
Date: October 13, 2017Memorandum of Disposition
Date: June 12, 2017Order:
Date: June 12, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: June 23, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: February 09, 2017Motion:
Date: February 24, 2017Request for Production
Date: March 02, 2017Mediators Report
Date: February 24, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: February 14, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: February 24, 2017Order:
Date: June 12, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: January 09, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: February 14, 2017Request for Production
Date: December 28, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: December 28, 2016Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 09, 2017Request for Production
Date: January 11, 2017Order:
Date: December 23, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: A H E Restaurant Management Group (LLC); Arlen House East Condo Assn Inc |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice 5/16/2018 AT 1:30 PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MAY 16,2018 AT 1:30 PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion: FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.