Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lesperance, Irene, Lesperance, Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joseph J Kalbac, Jr., Petit, Michael Garcia, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Jonathan G Liss, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Motion to Compel
Date: March 06, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 06, 2018Order on Motion to Compel
Date: February 22, 2018Order:
Date: February 22, 2018Motion:
Date: February 09, 2018Motion:
Date: May 04, 2018Motion:
Date: February 07, 2018Motion to Show Cause
Date: January 24, 2018Objection:
Date: April 12, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: April 06, 2018Order:
Date: April 09, 2018Order of Referral to Mediation Unit
Date: August 15, 2017Request for Production
Date: January 23, 2018Order:
Date: July 23, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: August 10, 2017Order on Motion to Compel
Date: July 07, 2017Request:
Date: July 31, 2017Order Case Pending Bankruptcy Stay
Date: September 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: August 09, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: August 22, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: August 03, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 06, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 23, 2018Order:
Date: July 12, 2018Order:
Date: July 09, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 03, 2018Motion to Tax Cost
Date: May 04, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: March 29, 2018Motion:
Date: May 08, 2018Order on Motion to Strike
Date: April 04, 2018Order:
Date: March 29, 2018Order:
Date: March 29, 2018Response:
Date: June 26, 2018Motion for Final Judgment
Date: May 04, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: April 13, 2018Motion:
Date: April 05, 2018Order:
Date: April 05, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 16, 2018Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: March 16, 2018Motion:
Date: March 12, 2018Order to Show Cause
Date: March 19, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 09, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: November 22, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: November 22, 2017Request:
Date: October 19, 2017Request:
Date: March 01, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: February 23, 2018Motion:
Date: March 07, 2018Order:
Date: September 29, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: June 16, 2017Request:
Date: June 20, 2017Objection:
Date: June 02, 2017Order:
Date: June 02, 2017Order:
Date: July 21, 2017Request:
Date: May 31, 2017Order:
Date: December 06, 2017Order:
Date: July 07, 2017Motion for Continuance
Date: January 04, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: December 28, 2017Motion in Limine
Date: January 04, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 04, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: September 25, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: March 07, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 21, 2017Motion/petit for Enforcement
Date: August 15, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: August 28, 2017Objection:
Date: March 06, 2017Order:
Date: February 22, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 01, 2017Request:
Date: March 06, 2017Request:
Date: July 03, 2017Motion to Withdraw
Date: August 29, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: August 25, 2017Request:
Date: July 05, 2017Objection:
Date: April 25, 2017Notice of Production
Date: April 25, 2017Objection:
Date: May 26, 2017Motion:
Date: July 06, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: June 29, 2017Request:
Date: April 25, 2017Request:
Date: April 06, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: April 11, 2017Motion to Quash
Date: April 17, 2017Objection:
Date: April 11, 2017Request:
Date: April 14, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: April 06, 2017Motion in Limine
Date: May 22, 2017Notice of Production
Date: May 23, 2017Motion:
Date: June 28, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: June 22, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: May 10, 2017Response:
Date: May 19, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: June 08, 2017Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: May 16, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: May 10, 2017Mediators Report
Date: May 10, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: May 19, 2017Notice of Production
Date: May 01, 2017Notice of Production
Date: April 01, 2017Notice of Production
Date: March 27, 2017Motion for Continuance
Date: April 06, 2017Order on Motion to Compel
Date: April 26, 2017Request for Production
Date: April 06, 2017Request:
Date: May 02, 2017Court Correspondence Letter
Date: January 05, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: April 25, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: April 25, 2017Request:
Date: April 19, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: March 20, 2017Order:
Date: March 15, 2017Request for Production
Date: April 10, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: March 23, 2017Motion:
Date: February 08, 2017Motion:
Date: March 06, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 06, 2017Notice of Production
Date: February 22, 2017Motion:
Date: February 06, 2017Objection:
Date: January 30, 2017Order of Referral to Mediation Unit
Date: January 30, 2017Notice Or Stipulation Designating Mediator
Date: February 03, 2017Request:
Date: January 30, 2017Request:
Date: December 30, 2016Request for Production
Date: December 12, 2016Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: December 12, 2016Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: February 03, 2017Request:
Date: January 27, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: January 30, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: January 13, 2017Objection:
Date: January 20, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: January 20, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: January 06, 2017Request for Production
Date: January 30, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: January 20, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: January 19, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: January 19, 2017Request for Production
Date: November 02, 2016Notice of Production
Date: January 10, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: December 19, 2016Complaint
Date: November 02, 2016Order on Motion to Compel
Date: June 15, 2017Final Judgment by Judge
Date: July 09, 2018Final Judgment by Judge
Date: July 06, 2018Order on Motion to Compel
Date: March 19, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: March 28, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Case Pending Bankruptcy Stay 18-21502-LMI Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy 18-21502-LMI Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 02, 2018 | Hearing |
5 Minute Motion Calendar Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFIDAVIT OF JONATHAN G. LISS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFIDAVIT OF DAVID F. BARON Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.