Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lsc Mobile Sales, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sykes, Bryan William, against Garcia, Adys, Lopez, Olivia, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2016 |
CategoryReplevin |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2018 | Hearing |
FWOP Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal *W/O PREJ PER NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: LOPEZ OLIVIA; GARCIA ADYS |
|
November 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Voluntary Dismissal *W/O PREJ PER NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice: FORBEARANCE AGREEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: LOPEZ OLIVIA |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3560017 AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:SYKES, BRYAN WILLIAM 4600 W CYPRESS ST STE 130 TAMPA FL 33607-4008 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYP Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: GARCIA ADYS |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.