Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marlin Financial Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lehrer, Ryan H, against Cruz, Barbara J, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Teretha Lundy Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2016 |
CategoryReplevin |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Replevin Returned Unexecuted Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: CRUZ BARBARA J |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Replevin Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Replevin Issued SENT TO THE SHERIFF W/CK$90.00#64654 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: CRUZ BARBARA J |
|
November 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Default Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: CRUZ BARBARA J |
|
November 16, 2016 | Hearing |
5 Minute Motion Calendar Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- NOVEMBER 16, 2016 AT 10:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.