Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grogan, Jacqueline, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Unknown Father, Williams, Lynea, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Deborah Magid presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2015 |
CategoryOther Petition |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Final Judgment
Date: November 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Closing Post Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter of Correspondence FROM GM DEBORAH MAGID, DATED 07/03/18 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on Report of General Magistrate Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Report of General Magistrate AND NOTICEOF FILING Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
General Magistrate Record of Proceeding Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 18, 2018 | Hearing |
By General Magistrate Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on Report of General Magistrate Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter of Correspondence FROM GENERAL MAGISTRATE DEBORAH MAGID, DATED 03/15/18 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Report of General Magistrate AWARDING TEMPORARY CUSTODY ETC. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Before General Magistrate DATED FOR 04-18-2018 11:00 A.M. Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.