Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tyler-Wright, Princess, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Bouie, Lee, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Yadira R. Pedraza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2017 |
CategoryOther Petition |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Reassignment Unified Family Court JUDGE CABALLERO Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Progress Case Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 28, 2016 | Hearing |
Child Support Enforcement Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 28, 2016 | Hearing |
5 Minute Motion Calendar MOTION FOR SANCTIONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance AGREED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hrg for Petitioner ON SEPT 28, 2016 @ 8:30 A.M. MOTION FOR SANCTIONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hrg for Respondent ON SEPT 28, 2016 @ 8:30 A.M. MOTION FOR SANCTIONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hrg for Petitioner OCTOBER 5, 2016 @ 10:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.