Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Muro, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Jonathan Gdanski, against American Tobacco Co, Brooke Group, Brown & Williamson Tobacco Corp, Liggett Group Inc, Liggett & Myers Tobacco Co, (total of 10) See All represented by Brenner, Andrew S, Cone, James, Gonzalez, Giselle, Hofmeyer, Lacey Diggs, Kane Jennifer C, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2014 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This complaint is filed by Phyllis Muro, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas Muro, against several tobacco companies including R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Philip Morris - USA, Inc., Lorillard Tobacco Company, Liggett Group LLC...
Answer
Date: August 25, 2014Mandate From Appeals Court
Date: June 22, 2018Motion:
Date: March 21, 2016Letter of Correspondence
Date: July 10, 2017Motion for Change of Venue
Date: September 27, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: April 05, 2016Complaint
Date: July 29, 2014Stipulation
Date: December 07, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: March 17, 2016Order Granting Protective Order
Date: March 22, 2016Letter of Correspondence
Date: July 27, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 02, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: November 03, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: February 06, 2015Request for Production
Date: January 20, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: April 03, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: May 29, 2015Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: August 22, 2014Request for Production
Date: October 08, 2014Request for Production
Date: August 30, 2016Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: August 25, 2014Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: September 03, 2014Response:
Date: September 06, 2016Memorandum
Date: October 10, 2014Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: September 03, 2014Response to Request for Production
Date: October 12, 2016Order:
Date: July 07, 2017Response:
Date: October 18, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: July 06, 2015Order on Motion to Compel
Date: July 10, 2015Notice of Appeal Non-Final Order
Date: August 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail FROM JAMES CONE, ESQ., Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt: FROM MARTIN COUNTY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Registered Mail FROM MARTIN COUNTY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter of Correspondence TO JONATHAN GDANSKI, ESQ., & JAMES CONE, ESQ., CASE TRANSFERRED TO MARTIN COUNTY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Text PAID $401.00 #043527 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Transfer (Change of Venue) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mandate From Appeals Court AFFIRMED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD & REQUEST TO BE REMOVED FROM ALL SVC & ETC Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3370347 AMT PAID:$111.00 NAME:BARD D ROCKENBACH 444 W RAILROAD AVE STE 350 WEST PALM BEACH FL 33401-4134 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3121-CERTIFIED 1 $2.00 $2.00 3060-CIRCUIT APPEAL - C 1 $100.00 $100.00 3120-COPY 1 $9.00 $9.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$111.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/04/2017 REGISTER#:337 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Non-Final Order Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.