Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ferrera, Vicente, Garcia, Hector, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Luis S Konski, Ronald Shindler, against Duffy, Christina, Duffy, Paul, Global Capital Advisors, represented by Cohen, Michael S., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2013 |
CategoryBusiness Transactions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by plaintiffs Hector Garcia and Vicente Ferrera against defendants Global Capital Advisors, LLC and Paul Duffy. The complaint alleges violations of statutes related to breach of fiduciary duty and fraudulent transfer. The plai...
Motion:
Date: July 19, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 16, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: October 16, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: January 09, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: January 08, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 08, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 27, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: June 23, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 08, 2017Request for Production
Date: May 19, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: November 29, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 29, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: November 08, 2017Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 31, 2013Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 02, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 06, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: November 06, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: November 07, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 07, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: January 25, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: October 06, 2017Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 04, 2017Memorandum
Date: October 12, 2016Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: May 05, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 27, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 05, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 14, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: October 04, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 26, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: September 27, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: September 26, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 21, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: August 17, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 16, 2017Motion for Sanctions
Date: May 03, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 03, 2016Order Extending Time for
Date: February 23, 2016Order Extending Time for
Date: August 08, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 11, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 31, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: August 01, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: August 01, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 04, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 27, 2017Request for Production
Date: July 20, 2017Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 20, 2017Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 19, 2017Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 23, 2017Amended Complaint
Date: April 20, 2017Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 27, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: April 10, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 04, 2017Memorandum
Date: February 23, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: March 24, 2016Motion to Strike
Date: December 01, 2014Request for Production
Date: January 15, 2016Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 05, 2014Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: November 13, 2014Amended Complaint
Date: July 29, 2014Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 24, 2014Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 17, 2014Response:
Date: January 03, 2014Motion to Compel
Date: December 20, 2013Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 13, 2013Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 23, 2013Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 17, 2013Request for Production
Date: July 11, 2013Complaint
Date: May 02, 2013Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 13, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: September 19, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: July 10, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 24, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 03, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: February 21, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 15, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: April 03, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: December 19, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 20, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: March 14, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: May 16, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: November 28, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: March 13, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 21, 2018Stipulation
Date: December 13, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: January 30, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: February 20, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 31, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: January 31, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 30, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 25, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: September 19, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: August 30, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: August 31, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 30, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 29, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: August 22, 2017Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 08, 2017Order:
Date: March 17, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 04, 2017Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: March 09, 2017Objection:
Date: February 24, 2017Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 08, 2017Request:
Date: August 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: September 05, 2018Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: July 31, 2018Response to Motion
Date: September 28, 2018Request for Production
Date: September 11, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: May 29, 2018Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: July 06, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: April 25, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 16, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: April 04, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 04, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: April 25, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: May 15, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 25, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 14, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: October 18, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: January 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 20, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 19, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 09, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 18, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 18, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 17, 2017Order Extending Time for
Date: October 17, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 29, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: January 29, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: January 10, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 28, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 10, 2018Motion:
Date: July 18, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Global Capital Advisors (llc); Duffy Paul; Duffy Christina; Garcia Hector; Ferrera Vicente |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion TO BIFURCATE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: PLT OFFER TO SELL THEIR MEMBERSHIP INTEREST Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF SERVING OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO DEF'S Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.