Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ashley L Simon, against Bent Tree Center Homeowners Assn Inc, Bent Tree Community Assn Inc, Catania, Luis, Arbelaez, Edwin F, represented by Perez-Velis, Josie M., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2011 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Order (Recordable) B: 28843 P: 0962 OF DISMISSAL AS TO ALL PARTIES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Order (Recordable) B: 28844 P: 1019 DISMISSING THE CASE, LIS PENDENS DISCHARGED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 28833 P: 1382 LIS PENDENS DISCHARGED Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Arbelaez Edwin F; Catania Luis (deceased); Bent Tree Community Assn Inc; Bent Tree Center Homeowners Assn Inc |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 19, 2013 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal B: 28833 P: 1382 LIS PENDENS DISCHARGED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order: ORDD GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.