Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U S Bank Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Marisol Morales, against Ploj, Zvonimir, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2011 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ of Possession ATY:00032762 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF LIMITED APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Title B: 28360 P: 2702 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Disbursement (plaintiff) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued $ 6.60 DOC STAMPS/PL/PN Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Bid Amount $1,100.00/PL/23021 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Deposit $ 6.60 PL/DOC STAMPS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee 165.00 SALE OF 10/26/12 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.