Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sands Pointe Ocean Beach Resort Etc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gregg Grossman, Paul David Breitner, against Beneficial Florida Inc, One West Bank, Petruxxelli, Luz Marina, Indymac, represented by Gonzalez, Barbara, Joseph M Reichert, Martinez, Octavio L., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($0 - $50,000) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Petruxxelli Luz Marina |
|
October 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Calendar Call Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Default Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Witness List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Non-Jury Trial CALENDAR CALL IS SET FOR 10-29-2019 AT 10:30AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 28, 2019 | Hearing | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Due Date: Complete Date: | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: UPDATED PROOF OF INDEBTNESS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting the Initial Case Management Conference AT 9:30AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 07/09/2019 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.