Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sands Pointe Ocean Bch Resort Condo Etc, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Anthony Garrett, against Petruzzslli, Luz, represented by Martinez, Octavio L., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCondominium |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 27, 2014 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 29053 P: 3689 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 29053 P: 3689 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Petruzzslli Luz |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance ATTORNEY:00105058 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Petruzzslli Luz |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion: PNTS MTN FOR CASE MGMT CONFERENCE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 02/27/2014 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Copy of: OF CHECK Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text DN'S WRITTEN NOTIFICATION OF REPRESENTING HERSELF ETC Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw AS COUNSEL Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.