Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barrios, Juan, filed a(n) Declaratory Judgment case represented by Marco De La Cal, against Associates Capital Bank, Coast Credit Union, Harvey Ruvin Clerk Of Court, Palisades Acquisition Iv, Suntrust Bank, (total of 13) See All represented by Joseph N Tucker, Luis G Montaldo, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment J $ 0.00 BK:27627 PG:3549 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Wachovia Bank (na); Unifund Ccr Partners; Suntrust Bank; Associates Capital Bank; Palisades Acquisition Iv (llc); Coast Credit Union; Harvey Ruvin Clerk Of Court |
|
March 23, 2011 | Hearing |
Final Judgment by Judge J $ 0.00 BK:27627 PG:3549 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Response: TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL DECLARATORY JUDGMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 03/23/2011 09:00AM LS:01/23 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 555 P 01/09/2011 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Unifund Ccr Partners |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication PUB DATE : Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer ATTORNEY:00505031 TO THE COMPLAINT Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Harvey Ruvin Clerk Of Court |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Default Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Southeast Bank (na) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.