Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Century Grand I Lllp, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Diaz, Victor M, Jr, against Bankunited, Federal Deposit Ins Corp, represented by Patricoff, Harold E, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryBusiness Torts |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Order (Recordable) B: 28575 P: 0602 OF DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 28572 P: 3566 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Bankunited; Federal Deposit Ins Corp |
|
March 25, 2013 | Hearing |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 28572 P: 3566 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice 01/16/2013 08:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 01/16/2013 08:30AM LS:01/25 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice 12/05/2012 08:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 12/05/2012 08:30AM LS:01/25 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel RESPONSES TO ITS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION & INTERROGATOREI Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.