Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Iberia Tiles Corp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Theodore C Miloch Ii, against Fujian Nanan Xindong Yuan Stone Co, Marmocer, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order: TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 27966 P: 3830 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Fujian Nanan Xindong Yuan Stone Co (ltd) |
|
January 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 27966 P: 3830 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 03/21/2012 02:30 PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Fujian Nanan Xindong Yuan Stone Co (ltd) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.