Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Luciana A. Martinez, against An, Tae Sik, Las Brisas At Doral Community Assn Inc, Las Brisas At Doral Condo #5 Assn Inc, Vasquez, Pablo, Yoon, Ja An, (total of 6) See All represented by Alfredo Garcia-Menocal, Cantillo, Sara H, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1 N/K/A DEAN CORTES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail JUAN PABLO VASQUEZ Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Check Mailed $ 6035.00 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Check Mailed $ 162425.00 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1 N/K/A DEAN CORTES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail JUAN PABLO VASQUEZ Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Title B: 29108 P: 2452 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Disbursement (outside Bidder) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued $ 1008.60 DOC STAMPS/OB/PN Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued $ 6035.00 SHD LEGAL GROUP P A Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.