Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Padilla, Oscar, Padilla, Ana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jonathan D Wald, against Green, Diana Lynn, represented by Dexter Romanez, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 28217 P: 1425 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Green Diana Lynn |
|
July 31, 2012 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal B: 28217 P: 1425 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF REQUEST FOR ORTHOPEDIC EXAMINATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF & REQU FOR ORTHOPEDIC EXAM: 2/24/12 @ 11AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Multiple Notice of Taking Depositions Filed (2) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.