Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yunayev, Giora, Domatov, Yelena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alvarez, Hugo V., against Mendez, Robert A, Bergamo, Nancy, represented by Seeba, Betsy Suzanne, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 28779 P: 0071 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Bergamo Nancy; Mendez Robert A |
|
August 14, 2013 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal B: 28779 P: 0071 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 11/07/2013 11:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance ATTORNEY:00033322 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Bergamo Nancy; Mendez Robert A |
|
August 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Witness List AND EXHIBIT LIST Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Domatov Yelena; Yunayev Giora |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial 11/13/2012 09:30 AM CAL.CALL 11/01/12 AT 1:30PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance ATTORNEY:00637890 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Bergamo Nancy; Mendez Robert A |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.