Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Triton Group Inc, filed a(n) Negligent Security - Torts case represented by Bryant E. Esquenazi, against Reggaeton Beverage & Distributors Inc, Coco Rico Central Fla Inc, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryNegligent Security |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeNegligent Security |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2012 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 28308 P: 1065 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 28308 P: 1065 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Coco Rico Central Fla Inc; Reggaeton Beverage & Distributors Inc |
|
July 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 10/05/2012 10:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Coco Rico Central Fla Inc |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 517 P 01/13/2011 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Reggaeton Beverage & Distributors Inc |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Coco Rico Central Fla Inc; Reggaeton Beverage & Distributors Inc |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.