Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Edward B Pritchard, against Velazquez, Daniel, Velazquez, Gertha, Velazquez, Magdalena, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 28263 P: 4478 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Velazquez Gertha; Velazquez Magdalena; Velazquez Daniel |
|
August 30, 2012 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal B: 28263 P: 4478 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Discharge/release of Lis Pendens B: 28263 P: 4478 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Amount Due and Owning Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's Fees Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of: OF ATTY AS TO COSTS AND TIME EXPENDED Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.