Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wadler, Joan Weitzenkorn, against Hammocks Community Assoc Incorp, Lee Goldstein Construction Inc, Seijo, Maria, represented by Marrero, Julio C, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($250,000 Or More) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Counsel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Seijo Maria |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order: DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION & DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF REQUESTED IN THIRD PARTY AFFIDAVIT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion: EMERGENCY STAY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order: DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR MORE TIME Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of: 3RD PARTY TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION/PABLO G. PIZZINI Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued ORIGINAL WRIT GIVEN TO THE ATTY/ORDER Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Seijo Maria |
|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 29, 2015 | Hearing |
Mortgage Foreclosure MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.