Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lotz, Misty, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Scott L Poisson, against Villages Of Homestead Audubon, represented by Chaiet, David S, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryResid. Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2012 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal B: 27962 P: 4371 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 27962 P: 4371 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Villages Of Homestead Audubon (etc) |
|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Mediators Report Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial 01/03/2012 02:30 PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to Mediation Unit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appt of Medtr&cnfrnce 10/25/2011 02:00 PM JESSE S FAERBER Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.