Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Spiaggia Ocean Condo Assn Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lisa Kalman, against Bermudez, Teresa, Bermudez, Juan, represented by Vujin, Peter, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Other Action ($0 - $50,000) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Title B: 27962 P: 0723 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Disbursement (plaintiff) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued $ 6.60 DOC STAMPS/NF Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Order (Recordable) B: 27844 P: 1663 MTN TO RESCIND FORECLOSURE SALE DENIED; CLERK SHALL ISSU Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 09/27/2011 10:30AM LS:01/30 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO RESCIND FORECLOSURE SALE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance ATTORNEY:00641243 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Bermudez Juan; Bermudez Teresa |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Bid Amount $1,100.00/PL/5769 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Deposit $ 6.60 PL/DOC STAMPS Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.