Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wachovia Bank N A, Wells Fargo Bank N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Edward B Pritchard, Simowitz, Scott E, Esq, against Cach Llc, Labranche, Maglore, Labranche, Mary, Labranche, Rosemonde, Millo, Tanya, (total of 5) See All represented by Senat, Louis C., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($250,000 Or More) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Note and Mortgage Returned CANCELLED NOTE AND MORTGAGE PICKED UP BY ALBERTELLI LAW Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request: OF 11/16/2017 PROCESSED READY FOR PICK UP- : ORIGINAL CANCELLED NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE.- REQUEST BY ALBERTELLI LAW Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: ON MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT, DISMISS ACTION AND RELEASE LIS PENDENS. (OVJG ALREADY ENTERED ON 11-16-17) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3460012 AMT PAID:$50.00 NAME:ZARZESKI, MARISA PO BOX 23028 TAMPA FL 33623-2028 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3117-REOPEN CASE FEE 1 $50.00 $50.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/21/2017 R Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Vacate Judgment DISMISS ACTION Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Senat Louis C.; Labranche Rosemonde; Labranche Maglore; Cach Llc; Labranche Mary; Millo Tanya |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request: FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTE/MORTGAGE RECIEVED FROM ALBERTELLI LAW TODAY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2017 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 24, 2017 | Hearing |
5 Minute Motion Calendar Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.