Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sriro, Ruth Cohen, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Soto, Anthony J, against Winn Dixie Stores Inc, represented by Gene P Kissane, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryComm Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Order (Recordable) B: 28407 P: 2778 DISMISSAL STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 28397 P: 0116 BASED ON SETTLEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Winn Dixie Stores Inc |
|
December 07, 2012 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal B: 28397 P: 0116 BASED ON SETTLEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objections to Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: FOR COPIES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Email Notice with Party DANIEL.KLEIN@CSKLEGAL.COM Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Winn Dixie Stores Inc |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.