Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzalez, Ingrid M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Soto, Anthony J, against De La Guardia, Luis Felix, represented by Jonathan G Liss, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 28496 P: 4506 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: De La Guardia Luis Felix |
|
February 05, 2013 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal B: 28496 P: 4506 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice 11/13/2012 09:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice 11/13/2012 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text MUTUAL PRETRIAL STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY & SECONDARY ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRE Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.