Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Courts At So Bch Condo Assn Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Emseal Joint Systems Ltd, Swaysland Professional Engineering Etc, Acropolis Property Maintenance Inc, represented by Lopez, Raul R., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 28580 P: 3173 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Acropolis Property Maintenance Inc; Swaysland Professional Engineering Etc; Emseal Joint Systems Ltd |
|
April 01, 2013 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal B: 28580 P: 3173 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitution of Counsel Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Courts At So Bch Condo Assn Inc (the) |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: JKG@MCINTOSHWARTZ.COM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response: EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer ATTORNEY:00174424 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Courts At So Bch Condo Assn Inc (the) |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Email Notice with Party ESERVICE@TOBINREYES.COM Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Courts At So Bch Condo Assn Inc (the) |
|
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.