Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Asmar, Cesar, filed a(n) case represented by Valdes, Diego D., against Citizens Property Ins Corp, represented by Megan O Hamilton, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Date: January 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order A/O 16-12 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/c49fdd6c-a19e-4440-ab61-22749e1e8c72/runs/457aa258-caef-4a8b-bd62-a8f841a30d6b/executions/1845f06c-432e-4f6b-92b4-8334b4704aa6/results/c915f19f-b158-44b0-a4e8-9c2be6a10306/lines/ff07d100-60ce-4726-8eb5-79d10323dad9/Doc Order of Dismissal B: 27944 P: 4038 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 27944 P: 4038 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice 09/28/2011 09:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 09/28/2011 09:15AM LS:01/20 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss COMPLAINT Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.