Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Asset Acceptance, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Butler, Howard K., against Muguercia, Roberto, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order: TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 28007 P: 4116 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Muguercia Roberto |
|
February 22, 2012 | Hearing |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 28007 P: 4116 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 03/28/2012 11:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Muguercia Roberto |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Muguercia Roberto |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.