Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Home Finance, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Century Plumbing Wholesale Inc, Zulueta, Mercedes, Navarro, Arcadio, represented by Marrero, Julio C, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($250,000 Or More) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/f3ba5b04-f9d5-4d87-837e-4a3e3f678fe7/results/8b16cc59-c81a-4da9-9979-a864769939ab/lines/6a0a3791-9854-4149-9b4a-e85f8ed519fc/Doc Court Order (Recordable) B: 28116 P: 3034 OF DISMISSAL & SETTLEMENT STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/f3ba5b04-f9d5-4d87-837e-4a3e3f678fe7/results/8b16cc59-c81a-4da9-9979-a864769939ab/lines/6a0a3791-9854-4149-9b4a-e85f8ed519fc/Doc Discharge/release of Lis Pendens B: 28116 P: 3034 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/f3ba5b04-f9d5-4d87-837e-4a3e3f678fe7/results/8b16cc59-c81a-4da9-9979-a864769939ab/lines/0771266a-b3a1-4481-b8bf-0e8c41c22ae7/Doc Voluntary Dismissal B: 28114 P: 4202 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Navarro Arcadio; Zulueta Mercedes; Century Plumbing Wholesale Inc |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/f3ba5b04-f9d5-4d87-837e-4a3e3f678fe7/results/8b16cc59-c81a-4da9-9979-a864769939ab/lines/0771266a-b3a1-4481-b8bf-0e8c41c22ae7/Doc Discharge/release of Lis Pendens B: 28114 P: 4202 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text SETTLEMENT STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 28114 P: 4202 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text NHRG =- CAL CANCEL PER JUDGE FOR 04/27/12 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice 02/02/2012 08:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.