Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bankunited, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ronald G Rice, against Bankunited, Bulnes, Louis V, Bulnes, Velma M, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($250,000 Or More) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 27485 P: 2544 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/7697752b-27b6-44e2-a892-82eca29bea36/results/96878318-864a-4bff-b98d-84f5977b81f7/lines/bccb60d9-113e-478e-b517-d7ff610ed780/Doc Discharge/release of Lis Pendens B: 27485 P: 2544 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/7697752b-27b6-44e2-a892-82eca29bea36/results/96878318-864a-4bff-b98d-84f5977b81f7/lines/bccb60d9-113e-478e-b517-d7ff610ed780/Doc Voluntary Dismissal B: 27485 P: 2544 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Bulnes Louis V; Bulnes Velma M; Bankunited |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/7697752b-27b6-44e2-a892-82eca29bea36/results/96878318-864a-4bff-b98d-84f5977b81f7/lines/e770a0c1-6289-48bb-84f8-ec48e1e54d27/Doc Lis Pendens B: 27323 P: 0227 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1607 P 06/02/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Bulnes Louis V |
|
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Return for Unknown Party Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.