Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Markovic, Miljana, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Robert Carl Gross, against Carnival Corp, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2010 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/6d3198dc-24b0-40bd-af85-0f23e3a64135/results/bb7bb459-cd38-4b0d-834b-7053e1162aac/lines/aec26637-a23a-49fa-ad75-2b6848f6b93b/Doc Voluntary Dismissal B: 27387 P: 0838 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Carnival Corp |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 27387 P: 0838 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 858 P 05/21/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Carnival Corp |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Carnival Corp |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.