Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Simpson, Tanya Denise, against Bosque, Damaris, Bosque, Nelson, Hammocks Community Assn Inc, Mortgage Elect Reg Sys Inc, Royal Palm Place At The Hammocks, (total of 6) See All represented by Jonathan M Mofsky, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($250,000 Or More) |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee
Date: May 06, 2013Certificate of Disbursement (plaintiff)
Date: May 30, 2013Exhibit List
Date: April 03, 2013Final Disposition Document
Date: April 03, 2013Notice of Sale
Date: April 15, 2013Notice of Filing:
Date: April 08, 2013Certificate of Sale
Date: May 17, 2013Notice of Filing:
Date: May 14, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/6d3198dc-24b0-40bd-af85-0f23e3a64135/results/bb1bda20-832b-401e-afc8-be0c2abfbb6f/lines/36f7fa55-5a64-4259-8b07-060d008b4899/Doc Certificate of Title B: 28657 P: 3350 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Disbursement (plaintiff) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued $ 6.60 DOC STAMPS/NF Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Deposit $ 6.60 PL#29327 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Bid Amount $1,100.00/PL#29327 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFO OF POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST AND ADVANCES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee 165.00 SALE OF 5/14/13 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFIDAVITS Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.