Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fidelity Natl Title Ins Co, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Steven V Blount, against Lakes Titles Svcs, Ramos Pombo, Milagros, Stratton, Douglas D, Ramos Pomba, Millie, represented by Almansa, Alicia, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2010 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/140d69bc-4cc1-43e4-a0f7-bbb154c50e17/results/0cce09d3-f913-48b7-8915-8b739b371419/lines/3a8ac224-8f51-4566-bf49-7a3b6ac233a5/Doc Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 28183 P: 0816 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Lakes Titles Svcs (llc); Ramos Pombo Milagros; Stratton Douglas D |
|
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 28183 P: 0816 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 06/28/2012 10:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Substituting Counsel ATTORNEY:00040560 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Stratton Douglas D |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFIDAVIT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 621 P 05/24/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Ramos Pombo Milagros |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON DEFTS DOUGLAS STRATTON Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 621 P 06/03/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Stratton Douglas D |
|
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Cross Claim 395.00 # 116382 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.