Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citimortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Drew Melville, against Florbeni, Tonante, Hector Omar, Two Midtown Miami Condo Assn Inc, represented by Grizelj, Caryn L., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($250,000 Or More) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order: TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/140d69bc-4cc1-43e4-a0f7-bbb154c50e17/results/bd58b367-095a-4375-949c-b16d337112a1/lines/31369c89-4a4f-4003-b8c2-88e8b893bebf/Doc Order of Dismissal B: 28333 P: 0535 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Florbeni (llc); Tonante Hector Omar; Two Midtown Miami Condo Assn Inc |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 28333 P: 0535 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/140d69bc-4cc1-43e4-a0f7-bbb154c50e17/results/bd58b367-095a-4375-949c-b16d337112a1/lines/31369c89-4a4f-4003-b8c2-88e8b893bebf/Doc Discharge/release of Lis Pendens B: 28333 P: 0535 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: SEDWARDS@KGBLAWFIRM.COM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 12/11/2012 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order: GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLT'S COUNSEL Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.