Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bac Home Loans Svcing, Countrywide Home Loans Svcing, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Spicewood Owners Assn Inc, Novoa, Maria, Mendieta, Gabriel, represented by Triay, Carlos A, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($250,000 Or More) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/140d69bc-4cc1-43e4-a0f7-bbb154c50e17/results/617bf04c-5c83-4ac9-8444-764040d62fbd/lines/5d587d05-b269-41fd-a0d6-1be70b140121/Doc Certificate of Title B: 28609 P: 1947 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Text PRE-SALE FEE $70 PAID Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued $ 373.20 DOC STAMPS/MG Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Disbursement (plaintiff) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Bid Amount $62,200.00/PL/26014 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Deposit $ 373.20 PL/DOC STAMPS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order: DENYING MTN TO CNCL SALE SET FOR 04/08/2013 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MOTIONS 04/05/2013 08:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee 165.00 SALE OF 4/8/13 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.