Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grace, Chiquita, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Grossman, Richard A, against Boyd, Elisha, Harris, Cassandra James, represented by Hans A Laurenceau, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/140d69bc-4cc1-43e4-a0f7-bbb154c50e17/results/96c3f544-ced6-4030-b9d4-81e58ff0044e/lines/ea8f9182-3491-48d9-9fa6-ef4f279b9e8c/Doc Order of Dismissal B: 27882 P: 1814 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Harris Cassandra James; Boyd Elisha |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 27882 P: 1814 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Multiple Subpoenas Filed 4 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel DISCOVERY ANSWERS -GRANTED Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.