Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Porto, Antonio, Porto, Zenaida, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Hans Peter B Haahr, against State Farm Fla Ins Co, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2010 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/f5889d62-941a-43f6-a979-16b644c7cec3/results/940d3f2f-3744-4fd4-a89a-13d1a9e7f01f/lines/62357b8c-1319-4550-8869-56bb44b0ea77/Doc Voluntary Dismissal B: 28152 P: 4498 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: State Farm Fla Ins Co |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 28152 P: 4498 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitution of Counsel Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: State Farm Fla Ins Co |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Substituting Counsel ATTORNEY:00117935 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: State Farm Fla Ins Co |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF NONOBJECTION TO PRODUCE FROM NON PARTY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text SUBP DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO (4) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF NON OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.