Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pnmac Mrtg Oppt Fund Invst Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gabriel Itskovich Esq, Loney, Anthony E, against Doral Isles Community Assn Inc, Doral Isles Residents Assn Inc, Mateo, Iris O, St Lucia Townhomes Homeowners Assn Inc, represented by Casilla, Sunilda E, Eisinger, Dennis J, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($250,000 Or More) |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee
Date: April 14, 2015Order:
Date: September 08, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: February 24, 2014Returned Mail
Date: January 21, 2014Returned Mail
Date: December 10, 2013Affidavit as to Attorney Fees
Date: March 12, 2014Response:
Date: October 05, 2015Order Resetting Foreclosure Sale
Date: December 12, 2014Order:
Date: June 24, 2013Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 26, 2015Order:
Date: March 05, 2014Certificate of Disbursement (plaintiff)
Date: February 29, 2016Notice of Sale
Date: December 22, 2014Returned Mail
Date: January 21, 2014Notice of Sale
Date: August 12, 2015Order Case Pending Bankruptcy Stay
Date: July 15, 2014Witness List
Date: January 28, 2014Motion for Default
Date: March 06, 2014Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 27, 2014Order Resetting Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 09, 2015Motion:
Date: December 09, 2014Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee
Date: September 01, 2015Motion:
Date: January 20, 2015Motion for Writ of Possession
Date: June 29, 2016Notice of Hearing-
Date: January 27, 2016Notice of Appearance
Date: June 23, 2015Affidavit as to Attorney Fees
Date: March 06, 2014Final Disposition Document
Date: March 14, 2014Motion to Reset Sales Date
Date: July 09, 2015Notice of Sale
Date: March 25, 2015Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 14, 2014Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee
Date: January 15, 2015Order Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: January 09, 2014Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 10, 2013Affidavit for Atty Fee and Costs
Date: March 06, 2014Certificate of Sale
Date: September 15, 2015Notice of Hearing-
Date: November 07, 2013Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 26, 2013Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 01, 2015Notice of Change of Address
Date: August 16, 2013Notice:
Date: June 10, 2013Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 22, 2015Notice of Hearing-
Date: January 29, 2014Motion:
Date: September 03, 2015Affidavit as to Costs
Date: August 31, 2015Stipulation
Date: March 18, 2014Notice of Filing:
Date: November 05, 2013Objection to Sale
Date: September 18, 2015Returned Mail
Date: December 05, 2013Motion for Substitution of Parties
Date: January 29, 2014Notice of Hearing-
Date: September 03, 2015Notice of Hearing-
Date: January 20, 2015Order Case Pending Bankruptcy Stay
Date: April 24, 2015Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 22, 2015Notice:
Date: January 28, 2014Order:
Date: February 24, 2016Certificate of Mailing
Date: April 17, 2014Request for Production
Date: December 23, 2013Order:
Date: December 04, 2013Answer
Date: December 23, 2013Order Resetting Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 22, 2015Notice of Filing:
Date: March 14, 2014Order of Default
Date: March 07, 2014Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee
Date: July 07, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3520177 AMT PAID:$50.00 NAME:GLADSTONE, ROGER NEIL 1499 W PALMETTO PARK RD STE 300 BOCA RATON FL 33486-3322 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3117-REOPEN CASE FEE 1 $50.00 $50.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$50 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ of Possession Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Disbursement (plaintiff) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/c1c201c2-e919-4d5d-a971-fe1990a58718/results/92ec63a6-bdd1-49c4-b8a8-420881c81f77/lines/e6ac8234-4f97-4950-b59e-4736241d7a74/Doc Certificate of Title Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued DOC STAMPS/PL/PN/59499 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order: ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO FORECLOSURE SALE (OVERRULED) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
5 Minute Motion Calendar Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 02/24/2016 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Response: TO DEFENDANT OBJECTION TO FORECLOSURE SALE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Objection to Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.