Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, Bank Of New York, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Monica L Borne, against Nzerue, Cyril, Nzerue, Cyril I, Nzerue, I Huoma, Nzerue, Cyril Ike, Nzerue, Ihouma, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($250,000 Or More) |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee
Date: July 01, 2014Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee
Date: April 08, 2014Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee
Date: August 30, 2013Notice of Hearing Set-
Date: February 12, 2014Certificate of Sale
Date: July 14, 2014Order Resetting Foreclosure Sale
Date: April 09, 2014Order Setting Non-Jury Trial Courtroom 3-1
Date: April 01, 2013Final Disposition Document
Date: May 13, 2013Text
Date: September 10, 2013Motion:
Date: April 04, 2014Notice of Sale
Date: March 20, 2014Witness List
Date: April 30, 2013Notice of Filing:
Date: April 01, 2013Notice of Sale
Date: August 09, 2013Request for Hearing
Date: February 05, 2014Notice of Filing:
Date: April 29, 2013Notice of Hearing-
Date: April 04, 2014Order Resetting Foreclosure Sale
Date: March 04, 2014Notice of Sale
Date: June 11, 2014Receipt:
Date: April 04, 2014Exhibit List
Date: May 13, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued $ 1.05 DOC STAMPS/PL/GB Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Deposit $ 0.45 SURTAX Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Bid Amount $100.00\PL\7106 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee 195.00 SALE DATE OF 07/09/2014 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Foreclosure Sale TO 07/09/14 AND CNCL 04/15/14 SALE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Sale Cancelled 04/15/2014 09:00 AM CANCELLED PER COURT ORDER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Sale Date MTGE FORECLSU 07/09/2014 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
No Further Judicial Action NFC / NO FURTHER CANCELLATIONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.