Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Cordoba, Alfredo E, Esq, against Gonzalez, Aimee, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2010 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e4062962-a2f6-42dc-9cf3-26be70c615e7/results/71601df6-4a29-4594-bec5-8c79f80034c0/lines/4cbcc6f1-d15d-4300-87a4-da02d693ce4f/Doc Suggestion of Bankruptcy B: 28759 P: 0488 DN01 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: CHANGE FIRM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitution of Counsel Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: American Express Centurion Bank |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Parties Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment Ret BADGE # 88 P 01/19/2011 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Bank Of America N.A. |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Issued Court Registry Check $ 100.00 ANA DIAZ NOA,P.A.(GN01) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e4062962-a2f6-42dc-9cf3-26be70c615e7/results/71601df6-4a29-4594-bec5-8c79f80034c0/lines/bb24c468-66f7-48e3-891b-f1345244783a/Doc Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment B: 27576 P: 2458 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Bank Of America N.A. |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer of Garnishee Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Bank Of America N.A. |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF MAILING Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Garnishment Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.