Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of N Y Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Michael A Rodriguez, against Bella Automotive Group, Garcia, Regla M, United States Of America, Garcia, Regla Maria, Garcia, Regla Teresa Rojas, (total of 6) See All represented by Huerta, Jesus, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e4062962-a2f6-42dc-9cf3-26be70c615e7/results/a9aa343d-7e1b-47c0-b842-e1779d1e4c84/lines/8b23805a-1c8d-46b3-a24b-e0d8b75edd80/Doc Certificate of Title B: 28484 P: 0057 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Disbursement (plaintiff) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued $ 6.60 DOC STAMPS/CB Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Deposit $ 6.60 PL#5073 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Bid Amount $1,100.00/PL#5073 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee 165.00 SALE DATE OF 01/22/13 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Collection Fee 70.00 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.