Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
First Premier Helath Group Corp, Pineda, David, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Gonzalez, Neil M, against Progressive Express Ins Co, represented by Udell, Maury L, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Christine P. Bandin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: June 29, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 27741 P: 2227 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Progressive Express Ins Co |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 27741 P: 2227 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order: GRANTING DFNDNTS MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED ANSWERS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order: ON DFNDNTS MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER ANSWER TO INTERROGS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MOTIONS 04/12/2011 09:00 AM PLNTFS OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGS & RQPR & DEFT MCPL ETC Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MOTIONS 04/12/2011 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 04/12/2011 09:00AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.