Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
First Franklin Financial Corp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hansen, Emily Jane, against Clerk Of The Circuit Court, Michel, Marie, National Revenue Svc Inc, Pierre, Marc, Michel, Marie F, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Lis Pendens
Date: January 13, 2010Order of Dismissal
Date: January 19, 2011Discharge/release of Lis Pendens
Date: January 19, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 27558 P: 4521 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Pierre Marc; Michel Marie; National Revenue Svc Inc; Clerk Of The Circuit Court (etc) |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Discharge/release of Lis Pendens B: 27558 P: 4521 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 27558 P: 4521 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1583 P 01/11/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Pierre Marc |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Text SUMM ON UNKW TENANT #1 SVRD ON 01/11/10 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1583 P 01/11/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Michel Marie |
|
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Text SUMMON RTN UNK. SPOUSE - NO SERVICE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Text SUMMON RTN UNK. TENANT II - NO SERVICE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 88 P 01/07/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Clerk Of The Circuit Court (etc) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.