Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ziluck, Scott W, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Weinberg, Jeana, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Yadira R. Pedraza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2009 |
CategoryOther Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Order Removing Case From Printout Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Progress Case Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Order (Recordable) ADOPTING AND RATIFYING MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGRMT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order on Report of General Magistrate NOTICE OF FILING DATE 11232009 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Report: OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON FAILURE TO CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE ETC Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- HEARING FEBUARY 09, 2010 AT 2:00 P.M. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Objection: TO ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENMAGISTRATE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Report of General Magistrate AND NOTICE OF FILING DATED 11-23-09 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to Hearing Officer Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.