Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Villa Grande Condo Assn Inc, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Marc A Kuperman, against American Integra Inc, Glasscock, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCondominium |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.)
Date: January 24, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 27567 P: 1187 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: American Integra Inc; Glasscock Brian |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 27567 P: 1187 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 01/21/2011 10:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: American Integra Inc |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Glasscock Brian |
|
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 826 P 02/09/2009 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Glasscock Brian |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: American Integra Inc |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: American Integra Inc; Glasscock Brian |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.