Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Soto, Deniss, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Rojas, Rafael, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Karl S.H. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2007 |
CategoryOther Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Order Closing Open Pending Case from Computer Printout Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memo from SAO on Emancipation Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum RE ACTIVATE CD ACCOUNT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memo from SAO on Adjust CD Account RE-ACTIVATE CD ACCOUND=T / REDACTED VERSION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Warning to Inform Change Address Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Rojas Rafael |
|
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Account History Balance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Financial Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Rojas Rafael |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Recommended Order On: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Social Security Number Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Rojas Rafael; Rojas Irving D; Soto Deniss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.