Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Samuel, Dennis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Friedland, Jonathan, against Geico General Ins Co, Pastora, Jose A, represented by Gal Sinclair, Watkins, Charles H, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Order of Dismissal
Date: August 15, 2005Order of Dismissal
Date: December 09, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 24048 P: 2249 STIPULATION & JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Pastora Jose A |
|
December 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 24048 P: 2249 STIPULATION & JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Mediators Report Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Multiple Subpoenas Filed 3 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 23693 P: 1565 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Geico General Ins Co |
|
August 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 23693 P: 1565 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order: GRANTING PLTFF'S MTN TO BE EXUSED FRM 1ST WEEK OF TRIAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 08/11/2005 09:30AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.