Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Airan, Damodar S, filed a(n) Injunctive Relief case represented by Airan, Damodar Sarup, against Felberbaum & Associates, Mcz Centrum Bayshore, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2005 |
CategoryInjunctive Relief |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.)
Date: August 28, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 25913 P: 4332 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Mcz Centrum Bayshore (llc); Felberbaum & Associates (pa) |
|
August 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 25913 P: 4332 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 08/20/2007 11:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request: FOR INSPECTION OF PROPERTY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MOTIONS 11/23/2005 09:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.