Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Galabow Chiropractic Centre, Gray, Rosa, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mark D Feinstein, against United Auto Ins Co, represented by Craig R Posner, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2005 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Summary Final Judgment
Date: October 06, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Eligible for Destruction : 11/06/2011 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF ATTY'S FEE AND COSTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- SPECIAL APPT 11/21/2006 03:00 PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summary Final Judgment $ 0.00 BK:24994 PG:1691 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: United Auto Ins Co |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summary Final Judgment $ 0.00 BK:24994 PG:1691 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFO ALEXA ALEXANDER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFIDAVIT OF CARMEN OSORIO Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Entered Or Duplicated In Error NOTI ENTERED OR DUPLICATED IN ERROR Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.